Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10775026 | Global Dossier | 15.09.2020 | B2 | US2019376664 | 12.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP82396 | 12.12.2017 | EP16203825 | 13.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110291326B | Global Dossier | 21.09.2021 | B | CN110291326 | 27.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP82396 | 12.12.2017 | EP16203825 | 13.12.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018108891 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16203825 | 13.12.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3336412 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2020 | B1 | EP3336412 | 20.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16203825 | 13.12.2016 |