Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106854228B | Global Dossier | 29.05.2020 | B | CN106854228 | 16.06.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201510893907 | 08.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3178824 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201610384697 | 02.06.2016 | CN201510893907 | 08.12.2015 |