EP3178824 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING PIMECROLIMUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medichem, S.A. Fructuós Gelabert, 6-8 08970 Sant Joan Despi, Barcelona / ES | For all designated states BrightGene Bio-Medical Technology Co., Ltd. Building C25 No. 218 Xinghu Street, BioBay Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou Jiangsu 215123 / CN | [2017/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIANDONG, Yuan BRIGHTGENE BIO-MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. Building C25, No. 218 Xinghu Street, BioBay Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 02 /
YANGQING, Huang BRIGHTGENE BIO-MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. Building C25, No. 218 Xinghu Street, BioBay Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 03 /
JIANWEN, Chi BRIGHTGENE BIO-MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. Building C25, No. 218 Xinghu Street, BioBay Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 04 /
LIANG, Ge BRIGHTGENE BIO-MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. Building C25, No. 218 Xinghu Street, BioBay Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 05 /
CARRERAS I VILAGRAN, Marçal Provença, 66, 1er-4ª E-08029 Barcelona / ES | 06 /
PUIG SERRANO, Jordi Veïnat del Puig de Canet, 9 (Mas Quelot) E-17199 Canet d'Adri - Gerona / ES | [2017/24] | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2017/24] | ABG Patentes, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 16382592.0 | 07.12.2016 | [2017/24] | Priority number, date | CN201510893907 | 08.12.2015 Original published format: CN201510893907 | CN201610384697 | 02.06.2016 Original published format: CN201610384697 | [2017/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3178824 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07D498/18 | [2017/24] | CPC: |
C07D498/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PIMECROLIMUS | [2017/24] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING PIMECROLIMUS | [2017/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE PIMECROLIMUS | [2017/24] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/27] | 31.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP1817317 (TEVA GYOGYSZERGYAR ZARTKOERUEN [HU]) [AD] 1-14 * example -; claim - *; | [AD]EP1802635 (MEDA PHARMA S A R L [LU], et al) [AD] 1-14 * example -; claim - *; | [A] - JUNICHI UENISHI ET AL, "Synthesis of Enantiomerically Pure 8-Substituted 5,6,7,8-Tetrahydroquinolines", SYNTHESIS, STUTTGART, DE., (20020101), vol. 2002, no. 05, doi:10.1055/s-2002-23537, ISSN 0039-7881, pages 625 - 630, XP055342218 [A] 1-14 * Scheme 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-2002-23537 | by applicant | EP0427680 | EP1802635 | EP1817317 | EP2432791 | WO9901458 |