Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3242970
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
23.07.2021 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
21.04.2021 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
29.01.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.11.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.11.2020 |
First examination report |
|
28.01.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.02.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.01.2019 |
Change - applicant |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
16.03.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 18.04.2018 [2018/16] |
16.03.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 18.04.2018 [2018/16] |
03.02.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
31.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.10.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
13.10.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
13.10.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
19.09.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.09.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.08.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.08.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.08.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
22.07.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.07.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.01.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|