Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2018508607 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201500376 | 09.01.2015 | WO2016GB50042 | 08.01.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3242970 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201500376 | 09.01.2015 | WO2016GB50042 | 08.01.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112017014715 | 06.02.2018 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB201500376 | 09.01.2015 | WO2016GB50042 | 08.01.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2017009027 | 09.02.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201500376 | 09.01.2015 | WO2016GB50042 | 08.01.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016110711 | Global Dossier | 14.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201500376 | 09.01.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB201500376D0 | 25.02.2015 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201500376 | 09.01.2015 |