EP3242970 - COATING COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMERTECH SAS 43, quai de Grenelle 75015 Paris / FR | [2019/07] |
Former [2017/46] | For all designated states Imerys Minerals Limited Par Moor Centre Par Moor Road Par, Cornwall PL24 2SQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRESTON, Janet 19 Symons Close St Austell Cornwall PL25 3EH / GB | 02 /
BUTLER-LEE, Gavin 1 Morleigh Close St Austell Cornwall PL25 4QQ / GB | [2017/46] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/46] | Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 16700665.9 | 08.01.2016 | [2017/46] | WO2016GB50042 | Priority number, date | GB20150000376 | 09.01.2015 Original published format: GB 201500376 | [2017/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016110711 | Date: | 14.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3242970 | Date: | 15.11.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | D21H19/38, D21H19/40, D21H19/44, D21H19/54, D21H19/58, D21H19/60 | [2017/46] | CPC: |
D21H19/385 (EP);
D21H19/40 (EP);
D21H19/44 (EP);
D21H19/54 (EP);
D21H19/58 (EP);
D21H19/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/46] | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2017/46] | English: | COATING COMPOSITIONS | [2017/46] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE REVÊTEMENT | [2017/46] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/46] | 04.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/34] | 20.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2004063287 (IMERYS PIGMENTS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10-15 * paragraph [0094]; claims 1-74 * [I] 8,9; | [X]WO2009146416 (INT PAPER CO [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,10-15 * claims 1-20 *; | [X]WO2006081501 (IMERYS PIGMENTS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10-15 * claims 1-43; table 2 *; | [I]WO2007050763 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US], et al) [I] 1-4,12-15 * claims 1-10 *; | [A]FR2692605 (PROTEX MANUF PROD CHIMIQ [FR]) [A] 1-15 * example 1; claims 1-6 *; | [A]WO2008125873 (IMERYS MINERALS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2013121213 (IMERYS MINERALS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US5653795 (BROWN ALAN J [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |