Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10954319 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2021 | B2 | US2018066078 | 08.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15161898 | 31.03.2015 | WO2016EP56085 | 21.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102497897B | Global Dossier | 08.02.2023 | B1 | KR20170133421 | 05.12.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | EP15161898 | 31.03.2015 | WO2016EP56085 | 21.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6856539B | Global Dossier | 07.04.2021 | B2 | JP2018513894 | 31.05.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | EP15161898 | 31.03.2015 | WO2016EP56085 | 21.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL254052 | Global Dossier | 25.03.2021 | B | Priority number | Date | EP15161898 | 31.03.2015 | WO2016EP56085 | 21.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107531845B | Global Dossier | 19.02.2021 | B | CN107531845 | 02.01.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | EP15161898 | 31.03.2015 | WO2016EP56085 | 21.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2981194 | Global Dossier | 14.03.2023 | C | CA2981194 | 06.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15161898 | 31.03.2015 | WO2016EP56085 | 21.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2016239618B | Global Dossier | 13.08.2020 | B2 | AU2016239618 | 19.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15161898 | 31.03.2015 | WO2016EP56085 | 21.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3277747 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2020 | B1 | EP3277747 | 07.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15161898 | 31.03.2015 | WO2016EP56085 | 21.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112017020141 | 05.04.2022 | B1 | BR112017020141 | 03.07.2018 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP15161898 | 31.03.2015 | WO2016EP56085 | 21.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3277747T | 25.01.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP15161898 | 31.03.2015 | WO2016EP56085 | 21.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2837125T | 29.06.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP15161898 | 31.03.2015 | WO2016EP56085 | 21.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3277747T | 19.04.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP16712788 | 21.03.2016 | EP15161898 | 31.03.2015 | WO2016EP56085 | 21.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2715171 | 25.02.2020 | C2 | RU2017134704 | 24.07.2019 | A3 | RU2017134704 | 04.04.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | EP15161898 | 31.03.2015 | WO2016EP56085 | 21.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201707947Y | 30.10.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | EP15161898 | 31.03.2015 | WO2016EP56085 | 21.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI3277747T | 31.03.2021 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP16712788 | 21.03.2016 | EP15161898 | 31.03.2015 | WO2016EP56085 | 21.03.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016156078 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15161898 | 31.03.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3075769 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15161898 | 31.03.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3277747T | 25.11.2020 | T | Priority number | Date | EP15161898 | 31.03.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI756170B | 01.03.2022 | B | TW201708264 | 01.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | EP15161898 | 31.03.2015 |