EP3277747 - PRODUCTION OF A PMMA FOAM USING CROSSLINKING AGENTS, REGULATORS, AND BLOWING AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/06] | PRODUCTION OF A PMMA FOAM USING CROSS-LINKING AGENTS, REGULATORS AND BLOWING AGENTS | ||
[2020/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Operations GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [2019/50] |
Former [2019/46] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2018/06] | For all designated states Evonik Röhm GmbH Kirschenallee 45 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICHTER, Thomas Viktoriastrasse 66 64293 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
SEIPEL, Christoph Amtsgasse 98 64832 Babenhausen / DE | 03 /
BERNHARD, Kay Erzhäuserstrasse 41 64291 Darmstadt / DE | 04 /
KRISHNAMOORTHY, Sivakumara K. Theodor-Haubach-Strasse 3 64319 Pfungstadt / DE | 05 /
BÜHLER, Sebastian Rosenau 4 79104 Freiburg / DE | [2018/06] | Representative(s) | Evonik Patent Association c/o Evonik Industries AG IP Management PB 84/339 Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau / DE | [2020/46] | Application number, filing date | 16712788.5 | 21.03.2016 | [2018/06] | WO2016EP56085 | Priority number, date | EP20150161898 | 31.03.2015 Original published format: EP 15161898 | [2018/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016156078 | Date: | 06.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3277747 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3277747 | Date: | 11.11.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/00, C08F20/14 | [2018/06] | CPC: |
C08F2/44 (EP,IL,US);
C08J9/142 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C08F20/14 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
C08F2/38 (IL,KR,US);
C08F220/14 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C08F222/102 (EP,IL,US);
C08J9/00 (IL,RU);
C08J9/02 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C08J9/06 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C08J9/228 (IL,US);
C08L33/12 (IL,US);
C08J2201/026 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C08J2203/12 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C08J2205/046 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C08J2205/10 (EP,IL,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG EINES PMMA-SCHAUMSTOFFS UNTER VERWENDUNG VON VERNETZERN, REGLERN UND TREIBMITTELN | [2018/06] | English: | PRODUCTION OF A PMMA FOAM USING CROSSLINKING AGENTS, REGULATORS, AND BLOWING AGENTS | [2020/37] | French: | FABRICATION D'UNE MOUSSE DE PMMA À L'AIDE D'AGENTS DE RÉTICULATION, DE RÉGULATEURS ET D'AGENTS GONFLANTS | [2020/37] |
Former [2018/06] | PRODUCTION OF A PMMA FOAM USING CROSS-LINKING AGENTS, REGULATORS AND BLOWING AGENTS | ||
Former [2018/06] | FABRICATION D'UNE MOUSSE DE PMMA PAR L'UTILISATION D'AGENTS RÉTICULANTS, DE RÉGULATEURS ET D'AGENTS GONFLANTS | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/06] | 07.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.11.2020 | 03.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 24.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.03.2016 | AL | 11.11.2020 | CY | 11.11.2020 | CZ | 11.11.2020 | EE | 11.11.2020 | HR | 11.11.2020 | LT | 11.11.2020 | LV | 11.11.2020 | MC | 11.11.2020 | MK | 11.11.2020 | MT | 11.11.2020 | RO | 11.11.2020 | RS | 11.11.2020 | SK | 11.11.2020 | SM | 11.11.2020 | BG | 11.02.2021 | GR | 12.02.2021 | IS | 11.03.2021 | IE | 21.03.2021 | LU | 21.03.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 21.03.2016 | |
AL | 11.11.2020 | ||
CY | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
MK | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
IE | 21.03.2021 | ||
LU | 21.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 21.03.2016 | |
AL | 11.11.2020 | ||
CY | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
IE | 21.03.2021 | ||
LU | 21.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
CY | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
IE | 21.03.2021 | ||
LU | 21.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
IE | 21.03.2021 | ||
LU | 21.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
IE | 21.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 11.11.2020 | |
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 11.11.2020 | |
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | CZ | 11.11.2020 | |
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HR | 11.11.2020 | |
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HR | 11.11.2020 | |
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | HR | 11.11.2020 | |
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | LV | 11.11.2020 | |
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | LV | 11.11.2020 | |
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | RS | 11.11.2020 | Cited in | International search | [IA]JP2000086804 ; | [XAI]JP2001302733 ; | [XA]JP2001233986 ; | [IA] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 26, Database accession no. 2000-298615, XP002742100 & JP2000086804 A 20000328 (SUMITOMO CHEM CO LTD) [I] 11-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] * [A] 1-10 | [XAI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 18, Database accession no. 2002-134683, XP002742101 & JP2001302733 A 20011031 (SUMITOMO CHEM CO LTD) [X] 11,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] * [A] 1-10 [I] 12 | [XA] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 74, Database accession no. 2001-642254, XP002742102 & JP2001233986 A 20010828 (KANEKA CORP) [X] 11-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0033] * [A] 1-10 | by applicant | FR1423844 | JPS4843054 | JPS55139433 | EP0032720 | EP0068439 | IL62693 | US4816492 | JP2002003635 | JP2006045256 | JP2012201704 | JP2012201705 | JP2013075935 |