08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
30.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
15.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
25.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
06.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
31.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
31.07.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
31.07.2020 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
08.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] |
01.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] |
24.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
10.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.05.2020 [2020/20] |
21.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
31.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
23.08.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] |
16.08.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
07.08.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
07.08.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
11.04.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.03.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.03.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 01.05.2019 [2019/18] |
29.03.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 01.05.2019 [2019/18] |
07.01.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.09.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.09.2018 |
First examination report |
|
25.05.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
25.05.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
27.03.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.02.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.12.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.01.2018 [2018/05] |
29.12.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
29.12.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.01.2018 [2018/05] |
04.12.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.08.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.08.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.07.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.07.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
14.07.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.10.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.09.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.04.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|