Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10765485 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2020 | B2 | US2018021094 | 25.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2015060166 | 23.03.2015 | JP2015208535 | 23.10.2015 | WO2016JP01198 | 04.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016179168 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2015060166 | 23.03.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3273899 | Global Dossier | 25.09.2019 | B1 | EP3273899 | 31.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2015060166 | 23.03.2015 | JP2015208535 | 23.10.2015 | WO2016JP01198 | 04.03.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016152046 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2015060166 | 23.03.2015 | JP2015208535 | 23.10.2015 |