EP3270749 - FOAMING DEVICE AND CORRESPONDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rancilio Group S.p.A. Viale Della Repubblica N. 40 20010 Villastanza Di Parabiago (MI) / IT | [2018/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÜHLMANN, Marco c/o RANCILIO GROUP S.P.A. Viale della Repubblica 40 20010 Villastanza di Parabiago (MI) / IT | 02 /
CARBONINI, Carlo c/o RANCILIO GROUP S.P.A. Viale della Repubblica 40 20010 Villastanza di Parabiago (MI) / IT | [2018/04] | Representative(s) | Robba, Pierpaolo Interpatent S.R.L. Via Caboto, 35 10129 Torino / IT | [2018/04] | Application number, filing date | 16715889.8 | 07.03.2016 | [2018/04] | WO2016IB51276 | Priority number, date | IT2015TO00177 | 20.03.2015 Original published format: IT TO20150177 | [2018/04] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016151422 | Date: | 29.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3270749 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3270749 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/44 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
A23P30/40 (EP,US);
A47J31/4485 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A47J31/40 (KR,US);
A47J31/4496 (KR);
A47J31/468 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHÄUMUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND ZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN | [2018/04] | English: | FOAMING DEVICE AND CORRESPONDING METHOD | [2018/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MOUSSAGE ET PROCÉDÉ CORRESPONDANT | [2018/04] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/04] | 29.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.08.2020
27.06.2023
DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED J.M. de Jong Duke Automatenfabriek B.V. Marisstraat 2 3364 AZ Sliedrecht / NL Opponent's representative Jilderda, Anne Ayolt LIOC Patents & Trademarks Zwaanstraat 31 L 5651 CA Eindhoven / NL | [2023/52] |
Former [2020/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.08.2020
J.M. de Jong Duke Automatenfabriek B.V. Marisstraat 2 3364 AZ Sliedrecht / NL Opponent's representative Jilderda, Anne Ayolt LIOC Patents & Trademarks Zwaanstraat 31 L 5651 CA Eindhoven / NL | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [ N /P ] | 29.09.2020 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Opposition is deemed not to be filed 01 | 18.06.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.10.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.06.2023 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular right | 27.06.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 27.11.2023 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 27.11.2023 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Appeal following opposition | 19.01.2024 | Appeal received No. T0129/24 | 19.01.2024 | Payment of appeal fee | 27.03.2024 | Statement of grounds filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.03.2016 | AL | 20.11.2019 | AT | 20.11.2019 | CY | 20.11.2019 | CZ | 20.11.2019 | DK | 20.11.2019 | EE | 20.11.2019 | FI | 20.11.2019 | HR | 20.11.2019 | LT | 20.11.2019 | LV | 20.11.2019 | MC | 20.11.2019 | MK | 20.11.2019 | MT | 20.11.2019 | PL | 20.11.2019 | RO | 20.11.2019 | RS | 20.11.2019 | SE | 20.11.2019 | SI | 20.11.2019 | SK | 20.11.2019 | SM | 20.11.2019 | TR | 20.11.2019 | BG | 20.02.2020 | NO | 20.02.2020 | GR | 21.02.2020 | IE | 07.03.2020 | LU | 07.03.2020 | IS | 20.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 07.03.2016 | |
AL | 20.11.2019 | ||
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CY | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
MT | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
TR | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IE | 07.03.2020 | ||
LU | 07.03.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IE | 07.03.2020 | ||
LU | 07.03.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IE | 07.03.2020 | ||
LU | 07.03.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
LU | 07.03.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 20.02.2020 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2014096183 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [AD] 1-13 * page 11, line 11 - page 18, line 18; figure - *; | [A]DE19719784 (IANCHELLO BATTISTA [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,8 * column 4, line 62 - column 7, line 49; figures 1,11-14 *; | [A]DE20204085U (EUGSTER FRISMAG AG ROMANSHORN [CH]) [A] 1-13 * page 5, line 21 - page 8, line 32; figure - *; | [A]US2005118319 (GREEN CHARLES B [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0020] - [0049]; figures 1,2,3,5 *; | [A]EP2798988 (MELITTA SYSTEMSERVICE GMBH & CO KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT [DE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0037] - [0076]; figures 2c,2d,3a *; | [A]DE102013224786 (WMF AG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0059] - [0084]; figure - * | Examination | WO2014096183 | Opposition | WO03068039 | WO2014096183 |