|
05.08.2024 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2024 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
31.07.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2024 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
03.04.2024 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.2024 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
05.02.2024 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.02.2024 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.01.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2024 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.12.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2023 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2023 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2023 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.12.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2023 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.11.2023 |
Decision concerning the inadmissibility of the opposition to opponent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.11.2023 |
Decision concerning the inadmissibility of the opposition to opponent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.11.2023 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.11.2023 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2023 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2023 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2023 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2023 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2023 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2023 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.11.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
27.11.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.11.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.11.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
27.06.2023 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.06.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.06.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.06.2023 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.06.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.06.2023 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2023 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.05.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
26.04.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 012 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.04.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 013 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 014 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2023 |
Consolidated list of cited opposition documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.04.2023 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.04.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 009 |
Opposition |
8 |
|
21.04.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 010 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.04.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 011 |
Opposition |
38 |
|
21.04.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2023 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.04.2023 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2022 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.12.2022 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.12.2022 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.12.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2022 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.12.2022 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.12.2022 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
09.12.2022 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
03.11.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
16 |
|
27.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.10.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.10.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 003 |
Opposition |
17 |
|
27.10.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 004 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.10.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 005 |
Opposition |
39 |
|
27.10.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 006 |
Opposition |
14 |
|
27.10.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 007 |
Opposition |
15 |
|
27.10.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 007 |
Opposition |
21 |
|
27.10.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 008 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.10.2021 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
18.06.2021 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2021 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.06.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.05.2021 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2020 |
Request for re-establishment of rights |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.09.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.09.2020 |
Noting of loss of rights (opposition deemed not to have been filed) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2020 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2020 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.08.2020 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
13 |
|
20.08.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 001 |
Opposition |
22 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
33 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.12.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.10.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.10.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.07.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
03.07.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
06.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.12.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2018 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2017 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.11.2017 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
25.10.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2017 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2017 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.08.2017 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.10.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
29.09.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.09.2016 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
19.05.2016 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
26.04.2016 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
12 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Translated claims for ISA/EP |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Translated description for ISA/EP |
International Searching Authority |
14 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Translation of the abstract for ISA/EP |
International Searching Authority |
1 |