19.06.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.03.2024 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
19.06.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.01.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
14.06.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.03.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.11.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.06.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.10.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.08.2020 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.06.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.04.2020 |
First examination report |
|
06.04.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.06.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.09.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] |
14.09.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] |
07.08.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
22.06.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
22.06.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.02.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
09.02.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
09.02.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
12.12.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.09.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.01.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.01.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.07.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|