Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10513034 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2019 | B2 | US2018207799 | 26.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15176105 | 09.07.2015 | WO2016EP63177 | 09.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107850885B | Global Dossier | 10.11.2020 | B | CN107850885 | 27.03.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | EP15176105 | 09.07.2015 | WO2016EP63177 | 09.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3292446 | Global Dossier | 14.03.2018 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP15176105 | 09.07.2015 | WO2016EP63177 | 09.06.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017005453 | Global Dossier | 12.01.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP15176105 | 09.07.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3115856 | Global Dossier | 11.01.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15176105 | 09.07.2015 |