EP3292446 - TRAJECTORY DETERMINATION METHOD FOR NON-PRODUCTIVE MOVEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2018/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRETSCHNEIDER, Jochen Hohenkreuzweg 21 73732 Esslingen / DE | 02 /
LINKE, Hartmut Franz Steinmetzweg 9A 91056 Erlangen / DE | [2018/11] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 16732493.8 | 09.06.2016 | [2018/11] | WO2016EP63177 | Priority number, date | EP20150176105 | 09.07.2015 Original published format: EP 15176105 | [2018/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2017005453 | Date: | 12.01.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3292446 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/4061, B25J9/16 | [2018/11] | CPC: |
B25J9/1666 (EP,US);
G05B19/4061 (EP,US);
G05B2219/39361 (EP,US);
G05B2219/40476 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/11] | Title | German: | TRAJEKTORIENBESTIMMUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR NEBENZEITBEWEGUNGEN | [2018/11] | English: | TRAJECTORY DETERMINATION METHOD FOR NON-PRODUCTIVE MOVEMENTS | [2018/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE TRAJECTOIRE POUR DES MOUVEMENTS EN TEMPS AUXILIAIRE | [2018/11] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/11] | 20.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | DE10343611 |