EP3319946 - METHOD FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF 2,6-BIS (METHIONYL) -1,4-DIKETOPIPERAZINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/20] | SIMPLIFIED AND SCALABLE METHOD FOR SYNTHESIS OF 2,6-BIS(METHIONYL)-1,4-DIKETOPIPERAZINE | ||
[2018/51] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2019 [2019/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [2018/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAUNE, Sascha Ringstraße 42 63505 Langenselbold / DE | 02 /
ROST, Daniel Emil-Heckel-Str. 20a 68163 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
BILZ, Jürgen Lessingstr. 11 63579 Freigericht / DE | 04 /
HÄUSSNER, Thomas Goethestr. 20a 64859 Eppertshausen / DE | 05 /
HASSELBACH, Hans Joachim Deutschordenstr. 6 63571 Gelnhausen / DE | 06 /
KOBLER, Christoph Centgrafenweg 12 63755 Alzenau / DE | [2018/35] |
Former [2018/20] | 01 /
BRAUNE, Sascha Bahnhofstr. 60 64404 Bickenbach / DE | ||
02 /
ROST, Daniel Emil-Heckel-Str. 20a 68163 Mannheim / DE | |||
03 /
BILZ, Jürgen Lessingstr. 11 63579 Freigericht / DE | |||
04 /
HÄUSSNER, Thomas Goethestr. 20a 64859 Eppertshausen / DE | |||
05 /
HASSELBACH, Hans Joachim Deutschordenstr. 6 63571 Gelnhausen / DE | |||
06 /
KOBLER, Christoph Centgrafenweg 12 63755 Alzenau / DE | Representative(s) | Evonik Patent Association c/o Evonik Industries AG IP Management Bau 1042A/PB 15 Paul-Baumann-Straße 1 45772 Marl / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 16733932.4 | 28.06.2016 | [2018/20] | WO2016EP64982 | Priority number, date | EP20150176058 | 09.07.2015 Original published format: EP 15176058 | [2018/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017005547 | Date: | 12.01.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3319946 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07D241/00, C07K5/062 | [2018/20] | CPC: |
C07D241/08 (EP,US);
C07K5/12 (US);
C07K5/0606 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] | Title | German: | VEREINFACHTES UND SKALIERFÄHIGES VERFAHREN ZUR SYNTHESE VON 2,6-BIS(METHIONYL)-1,4-DIKETOPIPERAZIN | [2018/20] | English: | METHOD FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF 2,6-BIS (METHIONYL) -1,4-DIKETOPIPERAZINE | [2018/51] | French: | PROCEDE DESTINE A LA SYNTHESE DE 2,6-BIS (METHIONYL)-1,4-DICETOPIPERAZINE | [2018/51] |
Former [2018/20] | SIMPLIFIED AND SCALABLE METHOD FOR SYNTHESIS OF 2,6-BIS(METHIONYL)-1,4-DIKETOPIPERAZINE | ||
Former [2018/20] | PROCÉDÉ SIMPLIFIÉ ET POUVANT CHANGER D'ÉCHELLE POUR LA SYNTHÈSE DE 2,6-BIS(MÉTHIONYL)-1,4-DICÉTOPIPÉRAZINE | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/20] | 21.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/43] | 06.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE2261926 (DEGUSSA) [AD] 1-18 * example 1; claim - *; | [A]WO2010112365 (EVONIK DEGUSSA GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-18; | [A]WO2011147881 (EVONIK DEGUSSA GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-18 * page 26, line 20 - line 24; figure 1; example 3; claims 1,17 *; | [A] - ANDREW P. MENDHAM ET AL, "Vibrational spectra and crystal structure of the di-amino acid peptide cyclo(L-Met-L-Met): comparison of experimental data and DFT calculations", JOURNAL OF RAMAN SPECTROSCOPY, GB, (20090101), doi:10.1002/jrs.2426, ISSN 0377-0486, pages n/a - n/a, XP055235936 [A] 1-18 * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jrs.2426 | [A] - GORDON L. HUG ET AL, "Factor analysis of transient spectra. Free radicals in cyclic dipeptides containing methionine", RESEARCH OF CHEMICAL INTERMEDIATES, NL, (20090401), vol. 35, no. 4, doi:10.1007/s11164-009-0044-6, ISSN 0922-6168, pages 431 - 442, XP055235938 [A] 1-18 * page 433; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11164-009-0044-6 | [A] - J. HOLCMAN ET AL, "OH-induced oxidation of cyclo-met-met. A search for a complexed OH-radical", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF RADIATION APPLICATIONS AND INSTRUMENTATION. PART C. RADIATION PHYSICS AND CHEMISTRY, (19910101), vol. 37, no. 3, doi:10.1016/1359-0197(91)90021-S, ISSN 1359-0197, pages 473 - 478, XP055235946 [A] 1-18 * page 473; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/1359-0197(91)90021-S |