Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.11.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
15.06.2017 | Supplementary search report | published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] |
15.06.2017 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.06.2017 [2017/23] |
15.06.2017 | Change - classification | published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] |
15.06.2017 | Change - classification | published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] |
15.06.2017 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.06.2017 [2017/23] |
26.05.2017 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] |
26.05.2017 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
26.05.2017 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] |
19.05.2017 | Change or deletion - publication of A document | published on 19.05.2017 [2017/25] |
02.05.2017 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.04.2017 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
13.01.2017 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.11.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.11.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.10.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.09.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.08.2016 | Change - representative | |
12.08.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.07.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication |