Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11563594 | Global Dossier | 24.01.2023 | B2 | US2018270075 | 20.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1556296 | 03.07.2015 | WO2016FR51632 | 30.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3318035 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2021 | B1 | EP3318035 | 09.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1556296 | 03.07.2015 | WO2016FR51632 | 30.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3318035T | 28.02.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR1556296 | 03.07.2015 | WO2016FR51632 | 30.06.2016 | EP16742354 | 30.06.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017006019 | Global Dossier | 12.01.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1556296 | 03.07.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR3038477 | 06.07.2018 | B1 | FR3038477 | 06.01.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1556296 | 03.07.2015 |