Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102477166B | Global Dossier | 12.12.2022 | B1 | KR20180035808 | 06.04.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016US39590 | 27.06.2016 | US201514811678 | 28.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6766131B | Global Dossier | 07.10.2020 | B2 | JP2018525912 | 06.09.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016US39590 | 27.06.2016 | US201514811678 | 28.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107852689B | Global Dossier | 11.09.2020 | B | CN107852689 | 27.03.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016US39590 | 27.06.2016 | US201514811678 | 28.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2016298501B | Global Dossier | 30.01.2020 | B2 | AU2016298501 | 18.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US39590 | 27.06.2016 | US201514811678 | 28.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3329726 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2020 | B1 | EP3329726 | 06.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US39590 | 27.06.2016 | US201514811678 | 28.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112018001582 | 18.09.2018 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US39590 | 27.06.2016 | US201514811678 | 28.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2805276T | 11.02.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US39590 | 27.06.2016 | US201514811678 | 28.07.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017019220 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514811678 | 28.07.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9913233 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2018 | B2 | US2017034800 | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514811678 | 28.07.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE049665T | 28.10.2020 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US201514811678 | 28.07.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI723027B | 01.04.2021 | B | TW201705790 | 01.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514811678 | 28.07.2015 |