EP3253957 - MATERIAL REPAIR PROCESS USING LASER AND ULTRASOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Energy, Inc. 4400 Alafaya Trail Orlando, FL 32826-2399 / US | [2017/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUCK, Gerald J. 5168 Casentino Court Myrtle Beach, South Carolina 29579 / US | 02 /
KAMEL, Ahmed 2439 Guiana Plum Drive Orlando, Florida 32828 / US | [2017/50] | Representative(s) | Patentanwaltskanzlei WILHELM & BECK Prinzenstraße 13 80639 München / DE | [2017/50] | Application number, filing date | 16747050.9 | 01.02.2016 | [2017/50] | WO2016US15911 | Priority number, date | US201514614767 | 05.02.2015 Original published format: US201514614767 | [2017/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016126586 | Date: | 11.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3253957 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.08.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F02C7/00, F01D5/00, B23P6/00, B23K26/354, B23K26/34, B23K28/02, B23K20/10, // B23K101/00 | [2018/43] | CPC: |
B23K20/10 (EP,KR,US);
F01D5/005 (EP,KR,US);
C23C24/106 (CN);
B23K31/02 (KR,US);
B23K26/34 (EP,KR,US);
B23K26/354 (EP,US);
B23K28/02 (EP,KR,US);
B23P6/007 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B23K2101/001 (EP,US);
F05D2230/31 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/50] | F02C7/00, F01D5/00, B23P6/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/50] | Title | German: | MATERIALREPARATURVERFAHREN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON LASER UND ULTRASCHALL | [2017/50] | English: | MATERIAL REPAIR PROCESS USING LASER AND ULTRASOUND | [2017/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉPARATION D'UN MATÉRIAU À L'AIDE D'UN LASER ET D'ULTRASONS | [2017/50] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 03.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/50] | 03.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/04] | 22.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2006157219 (BAMPTON CLIFFORD C [US], et al) [I] 1-5,12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0016] , [0021] - [0024] * [Y] 6-11,13,14; | [XI]CN103114286 (UNIV SHENYANG AEROSPACE) [X] 1,3-5,12 * see annexed translation;; example embodiment 1; claim 1 * [I] 2; | [Y]US2013136868 (BRUCK GERALD J [US], et al) [Y] 6-11,13,14* claims 1-20 *; | [A]US2014255620 (SHUCK QUINLAN Y [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2002148817 (TEWARI SUDHIR KUMAR [US]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0001], [0005], [0015]-[0017] and figures 1-2. *; | [A]WO2005077589 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0001], [0016], [0032] and figure 1. *; | [XY]US2006157219 (BAMPTON CLIFFORD C [US], et al) [X] 1-5 , 12, 15-18 * See paragraphs [0001], [0005]-[0009], [0016]-[0024] and figures 1-5. * [Y] 6-11, 13-14, 19-20; | [Y]US2013136868 (BRUCK GERALD J [US], et al) [Y] 6-11, 13-14, 19-20 * See paragraphs [0002], [0024]-[0028], [0036] and figures 1-2. *; | [A]US2014209571 (BRUCK GERALD J [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0001], [0019]-[0025], [0033] and figures 1-2. * |