|
19.05.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.06.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.02.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
53 |
|
19.02.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
55 |
|
27.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.08.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
27.08.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.08.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
27.08.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.08.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.05.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.05.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.02.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.02.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.11.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
30.11.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.11.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
30.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.11.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.08.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.08.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.07.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2018 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2018 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
21.03.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
12.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.04.2017 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
09.03.2017 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.03.2017 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
27.10.2016 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
26.10.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
26.10.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
26.10.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
06.09.2016 |
Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date |
PCT receiving Office |
9 |
|
29.08.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
29.08.2016 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
29.08.2016 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
29.08.2016 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
39 |
|
29.08.2016 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
29.08.2016 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
29.08.2016 |
Electronic request for grant of an International application |
PCT receiving Office |
8 |
|
29.08.2016 |
Incoming communication concerning PCT Direct |
PCT receiving Office |
52 |
|
29.08.2016 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
51 |