EP3268035 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR ACTIVATING "STIMULATOR OF INTERFERON GENE" -DEPENDENT SIGNALLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.01.2022 [2022/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aduro Biotech, Inc. 740 Heinz Avenue Berkeley, CA 94710 / US | [2018/14] |
Former [2018/03] | For all designated states Aduro BioTech, Inc. 740 Heinz Avenue Berkeley, California 94710 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATIBAH, George Edwin 34812 Candice Court Fremont, CA 94555 / US | 02 /
KANNE, David 5 Flying Cloud Course Corte Madera, CA 94925 / US | 03 /
SUNG, Leonard 25 Rolling Hills Avenue San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | 04 /
GAUTHIER, Kelsey 1531 Lafayette St 2 Alameda, CA 94501 / US | 05 /
GLICKMAN, Laura Hix 36 Rydal Ct. Oakland, CA 94611 / US | 06 /
LEONG, Justin 35128 Garcia St. Union City, CA 94587 / US | 07 /
MCWHIRTER, Sarah, M. 1010 Peralta Ave. Albany, CA 94706 / US | 08 /
DUBENSKY, Jr., Thomas, W. 25 Tanglewood Road Berkeley, CA 94705 / US | [2018/03] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/03] | Wills, Andrew Jonathan, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 16762447.7 | 09.03.2016 | [2018/03] | WO2016US21597 | Priority number, date | US201562131235P | 10.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562131235 P | [2018/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016145102 | Date: | 15.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3268035 | Date: | 17.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07H21/02, C07H19/213, C07H21/00, A61P37/06, A61P29/00, A61P35/00, A61P11/06, A61P3/10, A61K31/7084 | [2018/44] | CPC: |
A61K31/7084 (EP,EA,US);
C07H21/00 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K39/12 (KR);
A61K39/39 (EA,KR,US);
A61P11/06 (EP,EA,US);
A61P29/00 (EP,EA,US);
A61P3/10 (EP,EA,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,EA,US);
A61P37/06 (EP,EA,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/03] | A61K39/12, A61K39/39, C07H21/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/03] | Extension states | BA | 14.09.2017 | ME | 14.09.2017 | Validation states | MA | 31.08.2017 | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR AKTIVIERUNG EINER VOM STIMULATOR DES INTERFERON-GENS ABHÄNGIGEN SIGNALISIERUNG | [2018/03] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR ACTIVATING "STIMULATOR OF INTERFERON GENE" -DEPENDENT SIGNALLING | [2018/03] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS D'ACTIVATION DE LA SIGNALISATION DÉPENDANTE DE « STIMULATEUR DE GÈNES D'INTERFÉRON » | [2018/03] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 31.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.08.2017 | Examination requested [2018/03] | 24.09.2018 | Observations by third parties | 05.10.2018 | Observations by third parties | 24.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/02] | 24.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/02] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 03.02.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 03.02.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.02.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.04.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 16.04.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.04.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2016096174 (INVIVOGEN [FR]) [E] 1-14* Claims, in particular compound CL632 in claim 2 and example 1.14 * | International search | [Y]US2008286296 (EBENSEN THOMAS [DE], et al) [Y] 1-7, 8/1-7, 9/1-7 * ; paragraphs [0037]-[0041], [0048], [0050], [0101] *; | [A]US7592326 (KARAOLIS DAVID K R [US]) [A] 1-7, 8/1-7, 9/1-7 * ; entire document *; | [A]US7709458 (KARAOLIS DAVID K R [US], et al) [A] 1-7, 8/1-7, 9/1-7* ; entire document *; | [Y]US2014205653 (DUBENSKY JR THOMAS W [US], et al) [Y] 1-7, 8/1-7, 9/1-7 * ; figure 1; paragraphs [0070], [0083] * | by applicant | EP0296122 | US4978672 | US5637483 | US5698432 | WO9749395 | WO9835958 | US5811097 | WO9903854 | WO9920758 | US5904920 | WO9940196 | US5985290 | US6033674 | US6111090 | WO0103720 | US6277368 | WO0210192 | US6350445 | US6464973 | WO03037347 | WO03077914 | WO2004005281 | US6689607 | WO2004045532 | WO2004060319 | WO2004072051 | WO2005007190 | WO2005039549 | WO2005055808 | WO2005073224 | WO2005115451 | US7025962 | WO2006083289 | WO2006121168 | WO2006122806 | WO2007005874 | WO2007024945 | WO2007030377 | WO2007054279 | WO2007070514 | WO2007084786 | WO2007131201 | WO2007133822 | EP1866339 | EP0920505 | WO2008073687 | US7473761 | WO2009101611 | WO2009114335 | US7592326 | WO2009115562 | US7618632 | WO2009141386 | WO2010003118 | WO2010002655 | WO2010007120 | US2010028330 | WO2010019570 | WO2010027827 | WO2010026124 | WO2010029082 | US7709458 | WO2010060937 | US2010150946 | WO2010077634 | WO2010101849 | WO2010104833 | US7812135 | US2010310602 | WO2010149755 | US7867493 | WO2011025927 | WO2011028683 | WO2011051726 | US7943743 | WO2011066342 | US2011150892 | WO2011076786 | WO2011090754 | WO2011101409 | US8008449 | US8012469 | WO2011155607 | WO2012004367 | US2012039906 | WO2012022814 | US2012114649 | US8354509 | US8388967 | WO2013039954 | US8415355 | EP2581113 | WO2013079174 | EP1947183 | WO2013111105 | WO2013124826 | US8552156 | US8552002 | US8552003 | US8562997 | US8586023 | WO2013171639 | WO2013171640 | WO2013171641 | WO2013171642 | US8591886 | WO2013184757 | US8609089 | WO2014008218 | WO2014012479 | US2014044728 | US2014072566 | US8685980 | US8709424 | WO2014072493 | US8728476 | WO2014085318 | WO2014093936 | WO2014141104 | WO2014151616 | WO2014160160 | US8895705 | WO2014189805 | WO2015026684 | WO2015066188 | US2015210769 | US2015218274 | US2015259420 | WO2016096174 | - REED et al., Trends Immunol., (20090000), vol. 30, pages 23 - 32 | - DUBENSKYREED, Semin. Immunol., (20100000), vol. 22, pages 155 - 61 | - KASTENMULLER et al., J. Clin. Invest., (20110000), vol. 121, pages 1782 - 1796 | - COFFMAN et al., Immunity, (20100000), vol. 33, pages 492 - 503 | - YAN et al., Bioorg. Med. Chem Lett., (20080000), vol. 18, page 5631 | - SUN et al., Science, (20130000), vol. 339, no. 6121, pages 826 - 30 | - KRANZUSCH et al., Cell Reports, (20130000), vol. 3, pages 1362 - 68 | - JIN et al., Genes and Immunity, (20110000), vol. 12, pages 263 - 9 | - DINERGAO et al., Cell, (20130000), vol. 153, pages 748 - 762 | - CONLON, J. Immunol., (20130000), vol. 190, pages 5216 - 5225 | - JINYI et al., PLOS One, (20110000), vol. 8, page e77846 | - ZHANG et al., Mol. Cell., (20130000), vol. 51, pages 226 - 35 | - XIAOFITZGERALD, Mol. Cell, (20130000), vol. 51, pages 135 - 39 | - ISHIKAWA, H.BARBER, G.N., Nature, (20080000), vol. 455, pages 674 - 678 | - YI et al., PLos One, (20131021), vol. 8, no. 10, page e77846 | - IWASAKIMEDZHITOV, Science, (20100000), vol. 328, pages 1703 - 05 | - PANDEY, Cold Spring Harb Perspect Biol, (20150000), vol. 7, page a016246 | - EINSTEIN et al., Human Vaccines, (20090000), vol. 5, pages 705 - 19 | - AHMED et al., Nature Immunol., (20110000), vol. 12, pages 509 - 17 | - VANCE et al., Cell Host & Microbe, (20090000), vol. 6, pages 10 - 21 | - IRETONGALE, Viruses, (20110000), vol. 3, pages 906 - 19 | - CASKEY et al., J. Exp. Med., (20110000), vol. 208, pages 2357 - 77 | - BARBER, Immunol. Rev, (20110000), vol. 243, pages 99 - 108 | - ROMLING et al., Micrb. Mol. Biol. Rev., (20130000), vol. 77, pages 1 - 52 | - BURDETTE et al., Nature, (20110000), vol. 478, pages 515 - 18 | - BURDETTEVANCE, Nat Immunol., (20130000), vol. 14, pages 19 - 26 | - MCWHIRTER et al., J. Exp. Med., (20090000), vol. 206, pages 1899 - 1911 | - CRIMMINS et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20080000), vol. 105, pages 10191 - 10196 | - LEBER et al., PLoS Pathog, (20080000), vol. 4, no. 1, page e6 | - WITTE et al., mBio, (20120000), vol. 4, pages e00282 - 13 | - SAUER et al., Infect. Immun., (20110000), vol. 79, pages 688 - 94 | - DAVIES et al., Cell, (20120000), vol. 149, pages 358 - 70 | - DINERGAOABLASSER et al., Nature, (20130000), vol. 498, pages 380 - 84 | - XIAOFITZGERALD, Mol. Cell, vol. 51, pages 135 - 39 | - WILSON, J. Immunol. Methods, (19940000), vol. 175, pages 267 - 273 | - YARMUSH, J. Biochem. Biophys. Methods, (19920000), vol. 25, pages 85 - 97 | - WARD et al., Nature, (19890000), vol. 341, pages 544 - 546 | - VAN ERP et al., J. Immunoassay, (19910000), vol. 12, pages 425 - 43 | - NELSONGRISWOLD, Comput. Methods Programs Biomed., (19880000), vol. 27, pages 65 - 8 | - MCCUNE et al., Cancer, (19790000), vol. 43, page 1619 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 946414-94-4 | - HAMID, O. et al., New England Journal of Medicine, (20130000), vol. 369, no. 2, pages 134 - 44 | - YAMAZAKI et al., The Journal of Immunology, (19990000), vol. 163, pages 5178 - 5182 | - Crit. Rev. Ther. Drug Carrier Syst., (20040000), vol. 21, pages 387 - 422 | - Nanomedicine: Nanotechnology, Biology and Medicine, (20050000), vol. 1, pages 22 - 30 | - STRBO et al., Immunol Res., (20131200), vol. 57, no. 1-3, pages 31 1 - 25 | - DESSUREAULT et al., Ann. Surg. Oncol., (20070000), vol. 14, pages 869 - 84 | - EAGERNEMUNAITIS, Mol. Ther., (20050000), vol. 12, pages 18 - 27 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, American Pharmaceutical Association, (19750000), pages 1405 - 1412,1461-1487 | - C. AMMANP. MEIERA. E. MERBACH, J. Magn. Reson., (19820000), vol. 46, pages 319 - 321 | - ZHAO et al., Nucleosides, Nucleotides, and Nucleic Acid, (20090000), vol. 289, pages 352 - 378 | - YI et al., PLoS One, (20130000), vol. 8, no. 10, page e77846 | - BUTT et al., Protein expression and purification, (20050000), pages 1 - 9 | - ASLANIDIS et al., Nucleic acids research, 18.20, (19900000), pages 6069 - 6074 | - NIESEN et al., Nature protocols 2.9, (20070000), pages 2212 - 2221 | - FITZGERALD et al., Nature Immunology,, (20030000), vol. 4, no. 5, pages 491 - 496 | other | WO2016096174 |