EP3356066 - A FLUX FEEDING APPARATUS AND FLUX OPTIMIZATION SELECTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calderys France, S.A.S. Route de Troyes 51120 Sézanne / FR | [2024/43] |
Former [2019/15] | For all designated states IMERTECH SAS 43, quai de Grenelle 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2018/32] | For all designated states Imerys S.A. 43 Quai de Grenelle 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZINNI, Michael 25 Cottagewood Lane Grand Island, NY 14072 / US | [2024/32] |
Former [2018/32] | 01 /
ZINNI, Michael Friedrichstrasse 59 47441 Moers / DE | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [2024/32] |
Former [2018/32] | Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 16778725.8 | 28.09.2016 | [2018/32] | WO2016EP73157 | Priority number, date | GB20150017130 | 28.09.2015 Original published format: GB 201517130 | [2018/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017055377 | Date: | 06.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3356066 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3356066 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/108, B22D11/16 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
B22D11/108 (EP,RU,US);
B22D11/16 (RU);
B22D11/165 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUSSMITTELZUFÜHRVORRICHTUNG UND AUSWAHLVERFAHREN ZUR FLUSSMITTELOPTIMIERUNG | [2018/32] | English: | A FLUX FEEDING APPARATUS AND FLUX OPTIMIZATION SELECTION METHOD | [2018/32] | French: | APPAREIL D'ALIMENTATION EN FLUX ET PROCÉDÉ DE SÉLECTION D'OPTIMISATION DE FLUX | [2018/32] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 16.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]FR2418048 (LINER KAKOUKI CO LTD [JP]); | [I]DE3224599 (MANNESMANN AG); | [I]JPH01118350 (NIPPON SPENG CO, et al) | Examination | EP0101521 | by applicant | US2013081777 |