02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
26.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
05.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] |
10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
17.11.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
10.11.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
10.11.2023 |
Change - applicant |
published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] |
08.11.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
08.11.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
25.10.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.07.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.05.2023 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
04.04.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.10.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
19.10.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.08.2022 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.04.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.04.2022 |
First examination report |
|
23.10.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.10.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.11.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.01.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.12.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 30.01.2019 [2019/05] |
30.12.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 30.01.2019 [2019/05] |
02.11.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.08.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] |
03.08.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
03.08.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] |
09.07.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.06.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.05.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
25.05.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.05.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
16.05.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.05.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.11.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|