Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10494149 | Global Dossier | 03.12.2019 | B2 | US2018346203 | 06.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP75829 | 26.10.2016 | CH15692015 | 27.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3368437 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2022 | B1 | EP3368437 | 05.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP75829 | 26.10.2016 | CH15692015 | 27.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108473244B | Global Dossier | 11.10.2019 | B | CN108473244 | 31.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP75829 | 26.10.2016 | CH15692015 | 27.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108290670B | Global Dossier | 29.10.2019 | B | CN108290670 | 17.07.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | CH15692015 | 27.10.2015 | WO2016EP75824 | 26.10.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3368438 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2023 | C0 | EP3368438 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2023 | B1 | EP3368438 | 05.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH15692015 | 27.10.2015 | WO2016EP75824 | 26.10.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112018008327 | 30.10.2018 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CH15692015 | 27.10.2015 | WO2016EP75824 | 26.10.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2970544T | 29.05.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | CH15692015 | 27.10.2015 | WO2016EP75824 | 26.10.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2018005196 | 16.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | CH15692015 | 27.10.2015 | WO2016EP75824 | 26.10.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2018005197 | 16.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP75829 | 26.10.2016 | CH15692015 | 27.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3368438T | 08.04.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | CH15692015 | 27.10.2015 | WO2016EP75824 | 26.10.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017072188 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH15692015 | 27.10.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017072185 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH15692015 | 27.10.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CH711690 | 28.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH15692015 | 27.10.2015 |