EP3368438 - EXTRUSION BLOW MOULDED CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Unitary effect registered Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for unitary effect filed Status updated on 19.01.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Decision on the request for unitary effect | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Proprietor(s) | For all participating member states Alpla-Werke Alwin Lehner GMBH & Co.KG Allmendstrasse 81 6971 Hard / AT | [2024/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UNTERLECHNER, Oliver Brielgasse 28a 6900 Bregenz / AT | 02 /
NIGL, Christoph Wuhrweg 13 6922 Wolfurt / AT | [2018/36] | Representative(s) | Swisspat Riederer Hasler Patentanwälte AG Elestastrasse 8 7310 Bad Ragaz / CH | [2024/09] | Application number, filing date | 16790920.9 | 26.10.2016 | [2018/36] | WO2016EP75824 | Procedural language | DE | (Principal) place of business Tooltip on the date of filing | Principal place of businessTooltip | Unitary Patent Protection | 18.01.2024 | Date of request for unitary effect [2024/08] | 26.01.2024 | Decision on the request for unitary effect: Positive [2024/09] | 26.01.2024 | Date of registration [2024/09] | 20.12.2023 | Date of legal effect [2024/09] | Member States covered by Unitary Tooltip Patent Protection | 26.01.2024 | AT, BE, BG, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, IT, LT, LU, LV, MT, NL, PT, SE, SI [2024/09] | Publication | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3368438 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/51] |