Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
01.10.2019 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.06.2019 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.01.2019 | Supplementary search report | published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
25.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
25.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
03.08.2018 | Change: Validation states | published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] |
03.08.2018 | Change - extension states | published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] |
25.05.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.03.2018 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
09.03.2018 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
09.03.2018 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
09.02.2018 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.01.2018 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
13.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant | |
12.12.2017 | Change - representative | |
12.12.2017 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.12.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.12.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication |