Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10537398 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2020 | B2 | US2017360519 | 21.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2015109758 | 29.05.2015 | WO2016JP63555 | 02.05.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPWO2016194539 | Global Dossier | 06.07.2017 | A1 | JP6147459B | 14.06.2017 | B2 | Priority number | Date | JP2015109758 | 29.05.2015 | WO2016JP63555 | 02.05.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107249500 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2015109758 | 29.05.2015 | WO2016JP63555 | 02.05.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3305236 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2019 | A4 | EP3305236 | 11.04.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2015109758 | 29.05.2015 | WO2016JP63555 | 02.05.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016194539 | Global Dossier | 08.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2015109758 | 29.05.2015 |