Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108351085B | Global Dossier | 05.01.2021 | B | CN108351085 | 31.07.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016FR52760 | 24.10.2016 | FR1560175 | 23.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3365596 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2019 | B1 | EP3365596 | 29.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016FR52760 | 24.10.2016 | FR1560175 | 23.10.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017068309 | Global Dossier | 27.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1560175 | 23.10.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR3042751 | 07.09.2018 | B1 | FR3042751 | 28.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1560175 | 23.10.2015 |