EP3315114 - PRODUCTION METHOD FOR EASY-TO-TAKE SOLID PREPARATION, AND EASY-TO-TAKE SOLID PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daicel Corporation 3-1, Ofuka-cho Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0011 / JP | [2018/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMASAKI, Momoko c/o Daicel Corporation 1239 Shinzaike Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1281 / JP | 02 /
SAKAGUCHI, Anan c/o Daicel Corporation 1239 Shinzaike Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1281 / JP | 03 /
OKABAYASHI, Tomohito c/o Daicel Corporation 1239 Shinzaike Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1281 / JP | 04 /
HASHIKAWA, Naohiro c/o Daicel Corporation 1239 Shinzaike Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1281 / JP | 05 /
HIRAMURA, Takahiro c/o Daicel Corporation JR Shinagawa East Bldg. 18-1 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8230 / JP | [2018/18] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/33] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2018/18] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16817904.2 | 28.06.2016 | [2018/18] | WO2016JP69112 | Priority number, date | JP20150129529 | 29.06.2015 Original published format: JP 2015129529 | [2018/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017002796 | Date: | 05.01.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3315114 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3315114 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/28, A61J3/10, A61J3/06, A61K47/36, A61K47/38, B30B11/34 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
A61J3/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/2893 (EP,KR,US);
A61J3/005 (US);
A61J3/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/2095 (KR);
A61K9/282 (KR);
A61K9/2826 (US);
A61K9/286 (EP,US);
A61K9/2866 (KR,US);
B30B11/34 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/18] | A61J3/10, A61J3/06, A61K9/28, A61K47/36, A61K47/38, A61K47/42, B30B11/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE LEICHT EINZUNEHMENDE FESTE ZUBEREITUNG UND LEICHT EINZUNEHMENDE FESTE ZUBEREITUNG | [2018/18] | English: | PRODUCTION METHOD FOR EASY-TO-TAKE SOLID PREPARATION, AND EASY-TO-TAKE SOLID PREPARATION | [2018/18] | French: | PRÉPARATION SOLIDE FACILE À PRENDRE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELLE-CI | [2018/18] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2018 | Translation filed | 09.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 09.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/18] | 09.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.06.2016 | AL | 12.08.2020 | AT | 12.08.2020 | CY | 12.08.2020 | CZ | 12.08.2020 | DK | 12.08.2020 | EE | 12.08.2020 | ES | 12.08.2020 | FI | 12.08.2020 | HR | 12.08.2020 | IT | 12.08.2020 | LT | 12.08.2020 | LV | 12.08.2020 | MC | 12.08.2020 | MK | 12.08.2020 | MT | 12.08.2020 | NL | 12.08.2020 | PL | 12.08.2020 | RO | 12.08.2020 | RS | 12.08.2020 | SE | 12.08.2020 | SI | 12.08.2020 | SK | 12.08.2020 | SM | 12.08.2020 | BG | 12.11.2020 | NO | 12.11.2020 | GR | 13.11.2020 | IS | 12.12.2020 | PT | 14.12.2020 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 28.06.2016 | |
AL | 12.08.2020 | ||
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CY | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
MK | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
PT | 14.12.2020 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 28.06.2016 | |
AL | 12.08.2020 | ||
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CY | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
PT | 14.12.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CY | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
PT | 14.12.2020 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
PT | 14.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 12.08.2020 | |
AT | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
ES | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 12.08.2020 | |
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | DK | 12.08.2020 | |
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
NL | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RS | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2762167 (MOCHIDA PHARM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * * example - * * claim - *; | [X] - A SINGH ET AL, "Design and in vitro evaluation of compression-coated pulsatile release tablets of losartan potassium", INDIAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, IN, (20120101), vol. 74, no. 2, doi:10.4103/0250-474X.103839, ISSN 0250-474X, page 101, XP055543651 [X] 8 * abstract * * page 102, column l, paragraph l - column r, paragraph 3; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4103/0250-474X.103839 | [A] - T. JAHN ET AL, "Press Chamber Coating as External Lubrication for High Speed Rotary Presses: Lubricant Spray Rate Optimization", DRUG DEVELOPMENT AND INDUSTRIAL PHARMACY, US, (20050101), vol. 31, no. 10, doi:10.1080/03639040500306161, ISSN 0363-9045, pages 951 - 957, XP055481278 [A] 1-8 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/03639040500306161 | International search | [XY]JPH09104621 (BENTORETSUPU SANTE KK) [X] 7-8 * , paragraphs [0007] to [0012]; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) * [Y] 1-6; | [Y]WO0126632 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP], et al) [Y] 1-8 * , page 40, line 17 to page 58, line 8; fig. 1 to 5 & JP 4817573 B & EP 1222917 A1 paragraphs [0186] to [0281]; fig. 1 to 5 & CN 1390120 A *; | [Y]JP2013132285 (SANEI GEN FFI INC) [Y] 1-8* , paragraph [0028] (Family: none) *; | [XY]JP2014532704 (Celgene Corp.) [X] 7 * , paragraphs [0122] to [0123] & US 2013/0109644 A1 paragraphs [0127] to [0128] & US 2014/0357567 A1 & US 2015/0216886 A1 & WO 2013/067043 A1 & WO 2015/195786 A2 & CA 2853949 A1 * [Y] 1-6, 8 |