EP3346170 - VALVE CAPABLE OF PREVENTING VORTEX AND CORE USED THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fluonics Corp. 163-2 Gwanghak-ro Hojeo-myeon Wonju-si, Gangwon-do 26302 / KR | [2018/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Sang Seon (Musil E-Pyunhan Sesang Apt. Musil-dong) 204-503 89 Mandae-ro Wonju-si Gangwon-do 26386 / KR | [2018/28] | Representative(s) | Zardi, Marco M. Zardi & Co. SA Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | [2018/28] | Application number, filing date | 16842079.2 | 12.05.2016 | [2018/28] | WO2016KR04982 | Priority number, date | KR20150124997 | 03.09.2015 Original published format: KR 20150124997 | KR20150134646 | 23.09.2015 Original published format: KR 20150134646 | KR20150134651 | 23.09.2015 Original published format: KR 20150134651 | [2018/28] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017039113 | Date: | 09.03.2017 | Language: | KO | [2017/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3346170 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F16K27/02, F15D1/02, F16K7/12, F16K51/00, F16K25/04, F16K7/16 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
F16K27/0236 (EP,US);
F15D1/02 (EP,US);
F16K25/04 (EP,US);
F16K27/0245 (US);
F16K27/0272 (EP,US);
F16K3/22 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/28] | F16K27/02, F15D1/02, F16K7/12, F16K51/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/28] | Title | German: | VENTIL ZUR VERHINDERUNG VON VORTEX UND DAFÜR VERWENDETER KERN | [2018/28] | English: | VALVE CAPABLE OF PREVENTING VORTEX AND CORE USED THEREFOR | [2018/28] | French: | VANNE APTE À ÉVITER UN TOURBILLON ET NOYAU UTILISÉ POUR CETTE DERNIÈRE | [2018/28] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2018 | Translation filed | 30.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/28] | 19.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/04] | 03.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CH388717 (SCHAEFFER & BUDENBERG GMBH [AT]) [X] 1-3 * page 1, line 4 - page 2, line 53; figure - * [I] 4,5; | [X]EP2014439 (GEMUE GEBR MUELLER APPBAU GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0017]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]JP2009121547 (ASAHI ORGANIC CHEM IND) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2163798 (ASAHI ORGANIC CHEM IND [JP]) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [X]EP2333386 (GEMUE GEBRUEDER MUELLER APPBAU GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025]; figures 1-5 * | International search | [Y]KR200280434Y (LEE, Kook Hee) [Y] 1-20 * See page 4, lines 5-14, claim 1 and figure 4. *; | [A]US2008029722 (IRWIN KEVIN M [US]) [A] 1-24* See paragraphs [0039]-[0045] and figures 1-6. *; | [A]KR20090020018 (FLUONICS CORP [KR]) [A] 1-24 * See paragraphs [0022]-[0038] and figures 3-5. *; | [XY]JP2009121547 (ASAHI ORGANIC CHEM IND) [X] 21-24 * See paragraphs [0004], [0013]-[0045] and figure 4. * [Y] 1-20; | [A]US2013009086 (WALKER SAMUEL C [US]) [A] 1-24 * See paragraphs [0024]-[0045] and figures 1-6. * |