|
02.08.2023 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2022 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2022 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2022 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
19.08.2022 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.08.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.05.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
12.05.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
26.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.05.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
26.05.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.05.2021 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.05.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.04.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2021 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.04.2021 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.11.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2020 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2020 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.04.2020 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2020 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2020 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2020 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2020 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.02.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.12.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.12.2018 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.12.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.12.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2018 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2018 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2018 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.09.2018 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2018 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.2018 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2018 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.05.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.05.2018 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
14.05.2018 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Confirmation of effective date of early entry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Amended drawings with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.03.2018 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.06.2017 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
04.05.2017 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2017 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2017 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
29 |