24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
26.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
17.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
04.08.2023 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
04.07.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
16.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
02.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
26.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.06.2023 [2023/26] |
05.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] |
28.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
14.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
03.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
27.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
20.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
26.08.2022 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] |
19.08.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
17.08.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
17.08.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
11.05.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.04.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.03.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.04.2022 [2022/16] |
18.03.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.04.2022 [2022/16] |
29.05.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.05.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.12.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.06.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.05.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.04.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
21.02.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.02.2020 |
First examination report |
|
04.06.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.01.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 06.02.2019 [2019/06] |
04.01.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 06.02.2019 [2019/06] |
04.01.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
27.09.2018 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
21.09.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
21.09.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
22.06.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] |
22.06.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
22.06.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] |
16.05.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.04.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.04.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.04.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
20.04.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
20.04.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.05.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.05.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|