EP3352132 - IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD AND IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/39] |
Former [2018/30] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAO, Jun Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Tao Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Yu Tsinghua University Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | [2018/30] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/39] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2018/30] | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstrasse 8 80992 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16858624.6 | 04.05.2016 | [2018/30] | WO2016CN80997 | Priority number, date | CN201510728119 | 30.10.2015 Original published format: CN201510728119 | [2018/30] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017071176 | Date: | 04.05.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3352132 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3352132 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06T1/60, G06K9/00, G06K9/62, G06T1/20, G06V10/94, G06V10/96 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
G06T1/60 (EP,CN,US);
G06F18/24317 (EP,US);
G06T1/20 (EP,US);
G06V10/764 (EP,US);
G06V10/955 (EP,US);
G06V10/96 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/43] | G06T1/60, G06K9/00, G06K9/62, G06T1/20, G06K9/46 | ||
Former IPC [2018/30] | G06T1/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/30] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD AND IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS | [2018/30] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE | [2018/30] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2018 | Translation filed | 20.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/30] | 20.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 22.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 26.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 28.09.2022 | AT | 28.09.2022 | CZ | 28.09.2022 | DK | 28.09.2022 | EE | 28.09.2022 | ES | 28.09.2022 | FI | 28.09.2022 | HR | 28.09.2022 | IT | 28.09.2022 | LT | 28.09.2022 | LV | 28.09.2022 | MC | 28.09.2022 | NL | 28.09.2022 | PL | 28.09.2022 | RO | 28.09.2022 | RS | 28.09.2022 | SE | 28.09.2022 | SI | 28.09.2022 | SK | 28.09.2022 | SM | 28.09.2022 | NO | 28.12.2022 | GR | 29.12.2022 | IS | 28.01.2023 | PT | 30.01.2023 | IE | 04.05.2023 | LU | 04.05.2023 | BE | 31.05.2023 | CH | 31.05.2023 | LI | 31.05.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
IE | 04.05.2023 | ||
LU | 04.05.2023 | ||
BE | 31.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
IE | 04.05.2023 | ||
LU | 04.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
LU | 04.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
LU | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2015030219 (MADABHUSHI ANANT [US], et al) [I] 1-5,11-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0102] * * paragraph [0223] * * paragraph [0251] - paragraph [0252] *[A] 6-10,16-20 | International search | [X]CN203930824U (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES PRODUCTS CHINA CO LTD) [X] 1-20 * description, paragraphs [0026]-[0029], and figure 2 *; | [A]US2014333635 (DEMOUTH JULIEN [FR]) [A] 1-20* the whole document * | Examination | US2014355879 |