EP3376939 - AUTOMATED METHODS FOR THE OBJECTIVE QUANTIFICATION OF RETINAL CHARACTERISTICS BY RETINAL REGION AND DIAGNOSIS OF RETINAL PATHOLOGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University Of Louisville Research Foundation, Inc. 300 E. Market Street Suite 300 Louisville, KY 40202 / US | [2018/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAAL, Shlomit 7305 Edgemore Place Prospect, KY 40059 / US | 02 /
EL-BAZ, Ayman 7002 Creekton Drive Louisville, KY 40241 / US | 03 /
HAJRASOULIHA, Amir, Reza Indiana University School of Medicine Ophthalmology Glick Eye Institute (GK 213) 1160 W Michigan St. Indianapolis, Indiana 46202 / US | [2021/11] |
Former [2019/01] | 01 /
SCHAAL, Shlomit 7305 Edgemore Place Prospect, KY 40059 / US | ||
02 /
EL-BAZ, Ayman 7002 Creekton Drive Louisville, KY 40241 / US | |||
03 /
HARJRASOULIHA, Amir, Reza Indiana University School of Medicine Ophthalmology Glick Eye Institute (GK 213) 1160 W Michigan St. Indianapolis, Indiana 46202 / US | |||
Former [2018/39] | 01 /
SCHAAL, Shlomit 7305 Edgemore Place Prospect, KY 40059 / US | ||
02 /
EL-BAZ, Ayman 7002 Creekton Drive Louisville, KY 40241 / US | |||
03 /
HARJRASOULIHA, Amir, Reza 856 West Nelson Street Apartment 1202 Chicago, IL 60657 / US | Representative(s) | Locas, Davide, et al Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l. Piazzetta Cappellato Pedrocchi, 18 35122 Padova / IT | [2018/39] | Application number, filing date | 16866774.9 | 01.03.2016 | [2018/39] | WO2016US20280 | Priority number, date | US201562256980P | 18.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562256980 P | [2018/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017087018 | Date: | 26.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3376939 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3376939 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, G06T7/12, G06T7/143, G06T7/149, G06T7/168, A61B3/12, A61B3/14, G06K9/46 | [2019/51] | CPC: |
G06T7/0012 (EP,US);
A61B3/102 (US);
G06T7/12 (EP,US);
G06T7/143 (EP,US);
G06T7/149 (EP,US);
G06T7/168 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10101 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20064 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20121 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/39] | A61B3/12, A61B3/14, G06K9/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE VERFAHREN ZUR OBJEKTIVEN QUANTIFIZIERUNG VON NETZHAUTEIGENSCHAFTEN NACH NETZHAUTREGION UND DIAGNOSE VON NETZHAUTPATHOLOGIE | [2018/39] | English: | AUTOMATED METHODS FOR THE OBJECTIVE QUANTIFICATION OF RETINAL CHARACTERISTICS BY RETINAL REGION AND DIAGNOSIS OF RETINAL PATHOLOGY | [2018/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉS AUTOMATISÉS DE QUANTIFICATION OBJECTIVE DES CARACTÉRISTIQUES RÉTINIENNES PAR RÉGION RÉTINIENNE ET DIAGNOSTIC D'UNE RÉTINOPATHIE | [2018/39] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 18.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 18.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 18.06.2018 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.2018 | 31.03.2019 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   21.06.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 11.05.2022 | AT | 11.05.2022 | CZ | 11.05.2022 | DK | 11.05.2022 | EE | 11.05.2022 | FI | 11.05.2022 | HR | 11.05.2022 | LT | 11.05.2022 | LV | 11.05.2022 | MC | 11.05.2022 | NL | 11.05.2022 | PL | 11.05.2022 | RO | 11.05.2022 | RS | 11.05.2022 | SE | 11.05.2022 | SI | 11.05.2022 | SK | 11.05.2022 | SM | 11.05.2022 | BG | 11.08.2022 | NO | 11.08.2022 | GR | 12.08.2022 | IS | 11.09.2022 | PT | 12.09.2022 | [2023/48] |
Former [2023/25] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SI | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 11.05.2022 | |
AT | 11.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
CZ | 11.05.2022 | ||
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
EE | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RO | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
SK | 11.05.2022 | ||
SM | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
DK | 11.05.2022 | ||
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
IS | 11.09.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
PL | 11.05.2022 | ||
RS | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
HR | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
LV | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
BG | 11.08.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
GR | 12.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
NL | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 11.05.2022 | |
FI | 11.05.2022 | ||
LT | 11.05.2022 | ||
SE | 11.05.2022 | ||
NO | 11.08.2022 | ||
PT | 12.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - ANDREW LANG ET AL, "Retinal layer segmentation of macular OCT images using boundary classification", BIOMEDICAL OPTICS EXPRESS, United States, (20130614), vol. 4, no. 7, doi:10.1364/BOE.4.001133, ISSN 2156-7085, page 1133, XP055531993 [Y] 1,3-7 * abstract * * Introduction; page 1135 - page 1136 * * Methods; page 1137 - page 1143 * * Experiments and results; page 1143 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/BOE.4.001133 | [Y] - GIMEL'FARB G ET AL, "Expectation-maximization for a linear combination of Gaussians", PATTERN RECOGNITION, 2004. ICPR 2004. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 17TH INTERNAT IONAL CONFERENCE ON CAMBRIDGE, UK AUG. 23-26, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA, (20040823), vol. 3, doi:10.1109/ICPR.2004.1334556, ISBN 978-0-7695-2128-2, pages 422 - 425, XP010724688 [Y] 1,3-7 * abstract * * Introduction; page 422 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICPR.2004.1334556 | [Y] - AYMAN EL-BAZ ET AL, "Precise Segmentation of 3-D Magnetic Resonance Angiography", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20120701), vol. 59, no. 7, doi:10.1109/TBME.2012.2196434, ISSN 0018-9294, pages 2019 - 2029, XP011490131 [Y] 1,3-7 * abstract * * Slice-wise segmentation with the LCDG models; page 2021 - page 2022 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TBME.2012.2196434 | International search | [Y]US7295695 (DAYAL ADITYA [US]) [Y] 2 * ; column 3, lines 33-34; figures 2, 3C *; | [XY]US2012150029 (DEBUC DELIA [US]) [X] 8-9, 10/8-9, 12-13, 15-17, 19-22, 24-25 * ; paragraphs [0008], [0013], [0016], [0030], [0053], [0056]-[0059], [0060], [0080], [0098 . [0104], [0121], [0126], [0132]-[0133], [0135], [0140], [0151]-[0153], [0156], [0181], [0189', [0193], [0224], [0231], [0251], [0254], [0259], [0263], [0265], [0277]-[0278], [0295], [0299 -[0300], [0303], [0308], [0319], [0334], [0340], [0357]; figures 2A, 3A-3F, 6A, 9, 13; tables 1, 4, 6, 19, 21-22 * [Y] 1-7, 11, 18-24; | [Y]US2013294009 (TAKEUCHI SYUNSUKE [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7, 11 * ; abstract; paragraph [0010] *; | [Y] - XU, J et al., "Three-Dimensional Spectral-Domain Optical Coherence Tomography Data Analysis for Glaucoma Detectio n", PLoS One, (20130211), vol. 8, no. 2, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0055476, page e55476, XP055598277 [Y] 18 * ; page 6, column 1, paragraph 1; table 1; DOl:10.1371/journal.pone.0055476 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0055476 | [Y] - COSTA, RA et al., "Retinal Assessment using Optioal Coheren..", Tomography. Prog Retin Eye Kes., (20060522), vol. 25, no. 3, pages 325 - 353, XP005464866 [Y] 23 * ; page 329, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.preteyeres.2006.03.001 |