EP3397594 - BINDERLESS ZEOLITIC ADSORBENTS AND METHODS FOR PRODUCING BINDERLESS ZEOLITIC ADSORBENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.06.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UOP LLC 25 East Algonquin Road P.O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US | [2018/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENG, Linda S. UOP LLC 25 East Algonquin Road P.O. Box 5017 Des Plaines Illinois 60017-5017 / US | 02 /
LESCH, David A. UOP LLC 25 East Algonquin Road P. O. Box 5017 Des Plaines Illinois 60017-5017 / US | [2018/45] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/45] | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 16882221.1 | 18.08.2016 | [2018/45] | WO2016US47477 | Priority number, date | US201562272531P | 29.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562272531 P | [2018/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017116511 | Date: | 06.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3397594 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 06.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C01B39/20, C01B39/22, C01B39/18, B01J20/18, B01J20/30, C07C7/13 | [2019/35] | CPC: |
B01J20/186 (EP,US);
B01J20/18 (KR);
B01J20/183 (EP,US);
B01J20/3028 (EP,US);
B01J20/3042 (EP,US);
B01J20/3064 (EP,US);
B01J20/3078 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/3085 (EP,US);
C01B39/20 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C7/13, C07C15/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/45] | C01B39/20, C01B39/22, C01B39/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/45] | Title | German: | BINDEMITTELFREIE ZEOLITHISCHE ADSORBENTIEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BINDEMITTELFREIEN ZEOLITHISCHEN ADSORBENTIEN | [2018/45] | English: | BINDERLESS ZEOLITIC ADSORBENTS AND METHODS FOR PRODUCING BINDERLESS ZEOLITIC ADSORBENTS | [2018/45] | French: | ADSORBANTS ZÉOLITIQUES SANS LIANT ET PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION D'ADSORBANTS ZÉOLITIQUES SANS LIANT | [2018/45] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/45] | 13.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2009326309 (PRIEGNITZ JIM [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * claims 1,5-7,9,19 * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] *; | [X]WO2010033277 (UOP LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * claims 1,3,5,8,10 * * paragraphs [0008] , [0010] , [0011] , [0013] , [0014] , [0039] *; | [X]US2012264993 (HURST JACK E [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * claims 1,2,8 ** paragraphs [0040] , [0042] - [0048] * | International search | [X]RU2404122 (SALAVATNEFTEORGSINTEZ AOOT [RU]) [X] 1-7 * , abstract, tables, examples 3, 6, 7, 9-14, claims *; | [A]US8557028 (HURST JACK E [US], et al) [A] 1-10* , claims *; | [X]US8859448 (CHENG LINDA SHI [US], et al) [X] 8-10 * , claims 1-6, abstract * |