|
22.05.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2024 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2024 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2024 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2024 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2024 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2024 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2024 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.01.2024 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.01.2024 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.01.2024 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2024 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2024 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2023 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.11.2021 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2021 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.06.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.2021 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2021 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2021 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2021 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2020 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2020 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2020 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2020 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.02.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2019 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2019 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2019 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
25.07.2019 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2019 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.2019 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.10.2018 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2018 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.08.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2018 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.05.2018 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.07.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
06.07.2017 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2017 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
17 |