26.08.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.05.2024 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.01.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.08.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.08.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.12.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.10.2021 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.08.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.06.2021 |
First examination report |
|
17.06.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
31.08.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.02.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.09.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.07.2019 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] |
26.07.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] |
26.07.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] |
10.04.2019 |
Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
01.03.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] |
01.03.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] |
05.10.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] |
05.10.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
05.10.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] |
11.09.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.07.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.06.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.06.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.06.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
23.06.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.08.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.07.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|