Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11033879 | Global Dossier | 15.06.2021 | B2 | US2018280926 | 04.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815997600 | 04.06.2018 | WO2016US47477 | 18.08.2016 | US201562272531 | 29.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20180100346 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016US47477 | 18.08.2016 | US201562272531 | 29.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108473326 | Global Dossier | 31.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016US47477 | 18.08.2016 | US201562272531 | 29.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3397594 | Global Dossier | 28.08.2019 | A4 | EP3397594 | 07.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US47477 | 18.08.2016 | US201562272531 | 29.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017116511 | Global Dossier | 06.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562272531 | 29.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI674145B | 11.10.2019 | B | TW201722552 | 01.07.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562272531 | 29.12.2015 |