EP3436274 - PRINTING DEVICE, COMPUTER READABLE MEDIUM AND PRINTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring TX 77389 / US | [2019/20] |
Former [2019/06] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive W. Houston, Texas 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Xin-Ling No. 20 Jia Feng Road $ WGQ FTZ Pudong Shanghai 200131 / CN | 02 /
FANG, Ying No. 20 Jia Feng Road $ WGQ FTZ Pudong Shanghai 200131 / CN | 03 /
CHANG, Wei-Fei No. 20 Jia Feng Road $ WGQ FTZ Pudong Shanghai 200131 / CN | 04 /
TANG, Qiang No. 20 Jia Feng Road $ WGQ FTZ Pudong Shanghai 200131 / CN | [2019/06] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/38] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2019/06] | Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 16910160.7 | 29.07.2016 | [2019/06] | WO2016CN92223 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018018580 | Date: | 01.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3436274 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3436274 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/165, B41J2/175, B41J29/13 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
B41J2/17523 (EP);
B41J25/001 (US);
B41J2/1752 (EP);
B41J29/13 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/06] | B41J2/165 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRUCKVORRICHTUNG, COMPUTERLESBARES MEDIUM UND DRUCKVERFAHREN | [2019/06] | English: | PRINTING DEVICE, COMPUTER READABLE MEDIUM AND PRINTING METHOD | [2019/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IMPRESSION, SUPPORT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR ET PROCÉDÉ D'IMPRESSION | [2019/06] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 23.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/06] | 15.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 21.09.2022 | AT | 21.09.2022 | CZ | 21.09.2022 | DK | 21.09.2022 | EE | 21.09.2022 | ES | 21.09.2022 | FI | 21.09.2022 | HR | 21.09.2022 | IT | 21.09.2022 | LT | 21.09.2022 | LV | 21.09.2022 | MC | 21.09.2022 | PL | 21.09.2022 | RO | 21.09.2022 | RS | 21.09.2022 | SE | 21.09.2022 | SI | 21.09.2022 | SK | 21.09.2022 | SM | 21.09.2022 | NO | 21.12.2022 | GR | 22.12.2022 | IS | 21.01.2023 | PT | 23.01.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/14] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
MC | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 21.09.2022 | |
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 21.09.2022 | |
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 21.09.2022 | |
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 21.09.2022 | |
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 21.09.2022 | |
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 21.09.2022 | |
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 21.09.2022 | |
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6003981 (CAMERON JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-15* figures 1-32 *; | [XAY]US2005168504 (PAN YICHUAN [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0050]; figures 1-5 * [A] 7-11 [Y] 12-15; | [XAY]EP1952991 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 7,8 * paragraph [0038]; figures 1-11 * [A] 1-6,12-15 [Y] 9-11; | [YA]US2011076046 (OH JOO YOUNG [KR]) [Y] 12-15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * [A] 1-11; | [YA]US2013093815 (KAWAMATA YUTAKA [JP], et al) [Y] 9-11 * figures 1-12 * [A] 1-8,12-15; | [A]US2013194354 (PETRUCHIK DWIGHT JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-13 *; | [A]WO2015136869 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-45 * | International search | [A]EP0890442 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2001063031 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002154192 (BALAKRISHNAN KUMAR [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]CN101088762 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]CN101234556 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 7-11 * description, page 5 line 25 to page 24 line 2 and figures 1-11 *; | [A]US8388107 (GOMEZ ARTURO GARCIA [ES], et al) [A] 1-15 * description, column 2 line 33 to column 5 line 16 and figures 1-13 *; | [A]CN202826729U (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | Examination | US6488369 | by applicant | EP1952991 | US2011076046 | US2013093815 | US2015168504 |