Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10107130 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2018 | B2 | US2017276013 | 28.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615079417 | 24.03.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3236017 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2021 | B1 | EP3236017 | 15.11.2017 | A3 | EP3236017 | 25.10.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201615079417 | 24.03.2016 |