Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021245398 | Global Dossier | 12.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916697491 | 27.11.2019 | US202117242976 | 28.04.2021 | US201615091802 | 06.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021245397 | Global Dossier | 12.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916697491 | 27.11.2019 | US202117242952 | 28.04.2021 | US201615091802 | 06.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11192279 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2021 | B2 | US2020094439 | 26.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916697491 | 27.11.2019 | US201615091802 | 06.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3789172 | Global Dossier | 01.06.2022 | B1 | EP3789172 | 10.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17165071 | 05.04.2017 | EP19196515 | 05.04.2017 | US201615091802 | 06.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3789171 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2023 | B1 | EP3789171 | 10.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17165071 | 05.04.2017 | EP19196515 | 05.04.2017 | US201615091802 | 06.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3597386 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2021 | B1 | EP3597386 | 22.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17165071 | 05.04.2017 | US201615091802 | 06.04.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10532490 | Global Dossier | 14.01.2020 | B2 | US2017291326 | 12.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615091802 | 06.04.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102309658B | Global Dossier | 12.10.2021 | B1 | KR20170114964 | 16.10.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201615091802 | 06.04.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7009074B | Global Dossier | 25.01.2022 | B2 | JP2017222156 | 21.12.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201615091802 | 06.04.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107263844B | Global Dossier | 02.02.2021 | B | CN107263844 | 20.10.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201615091802 | 06.04.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2963207 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2021 | C | CA2963207 | 06.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615091802 | 06.04.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3228435 | Global Dossier | 18.09.2019 | B1 | EP3228435 | 25.10.2017 | A3 | EP3228435 | 11.10.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201615091802 | 06.04.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2017004428 | 16.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201615091802 | 06.04.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2020013399 | 15.02.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201615091802 | 06.04.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2020013400 | 15.02.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201615091802 | 06.04.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2020013401 | 15.02.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201615091802 | 06.04.2016 | Type | Divisional application | EP3597386 | EP3789171 | EP3789172 |