06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
16.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
06.05.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
04.02.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
12.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
23.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
16.04.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
29.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
25.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
04.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] |
20.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
06.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
30.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
23.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
16.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
08.05.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] |
02.05.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.04.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
18.04.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
17.04.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
09.01.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.05.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.04.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.12.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.12.2018 |
First examination report |
|
18.05.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
18.05.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
18.05.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
18.05.2018 |
Change - designated states |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
18.05.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
11.05.2018 |
New entry: Fee payment for validation state |
|
11.05.2018 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
08.05.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.10.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
04.05.2017 |
Change - representative |
|