EP3428524 - APPARATUS FOR MOVABLE ATTACHMENT OF A LIGHTING BODY TO A MAST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REEL TECH Handelsges.m.b.H. Percostraße 31/B1 1220 Wien / AT | [2019/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dietrich, Erwin Algenweg 38A/1 1220 Wien / AT | 02 /
Horky, Daniel Deinhardsteingasse 29/28 1160 Wien / AT | 03 /
Kazbour, Raffik Reklewskigasse 2 1230 Wien / AT | [2019/03] | Representative(s) | Margotti, Herwig Franz Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 30 1010 Wien / AT | [2019/03] | Application number, filing date | 17181297.7 | 13.07.2017 | [2019/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3428524 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F21V21/38, F21S8/08, // F21W131/10 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
F21S8/086 (EP);
F21V21/38 (EP);
F21W2131/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEWEGLICHEN BEFESTIGUNG EINES BELEUCHTUNGSKÖRPERS AN EINEM MAST | [2019/03] | English: | APPARATUS FOR MOVABLE ATTACHMENT OF A LIGHTING BODY TO A MAST | [2019/03] | French: | DISPOTIF POUR FIXATION MOBILE D'UN CORPS D'ÉCLAIRAGE À UN MÂT | [2019/03] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/51] | 01.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/51] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]KR20090131996 (DASEUNG INNAVATION SYSTEM [KR]) [X] 1-4,10,12,13 * figures 1-5 * [I] 5-9,11,14; | [XI]KR20090131999 (DASEUNG INNAVATION SYSTEM [KR]) [X] 1-4,10,12,13 * figures 3-5 * [I] 5-9,11,14; | [XI]CN104176635 (SAN EI SEIKI SEISAKUSHO CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5,8 * figures 2-4 * [I] 6,7,9-14; | [XI]CN202609842U (NINGBO LURUN COOLER MFG CO LTD) [X] 1 * figure 1 * [I] 12,13; | [XI]KR20100004532 (DASEUNG INNAVATION SYSTEM [KR]) [X] 1-5,10,12,13 * figures 1-7 * [I] 6-9,11,14; | [XI]KR20100084767 (SHIN JEONG HOON [KR]) [X] 1,2,5 * figures 1-3 * [I] 3,4,6-11,14; | [A]JP2006261016 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD, et al) [A] 1 * figures 9-10 * | by applicant | AT506355B |