29.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
12.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
18.10.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
30.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
23.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] |
16.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
26.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] |
19.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
12.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] |
21.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] |
17.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] |
03.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
26.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
19.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
12.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] |
09.11.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
27.10.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.09.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
28.09.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
26.09.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
17.05.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.03.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] |
26.01.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
26.01.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
26.01.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
15.12.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.08.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.08.2017 |
Change - representative |
|