Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6921923B | Global Dossier | 18.08.2021 | B2 | JP2020041223 | 19.03.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2019218276 | 02.12.2019 | JP2017011523 | 25.01.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10829861 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2020 | B2 | US2018209053 | 26.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017011523 | 25.01.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6649293B | Global Dossier | 19.02.2020 | B2 | JP2018119181 | 02.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2017011523 | 25.01.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108339570 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2017011523 | 25.01.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3354338 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2019 | B1 | EP3354338 | 01.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017011523 | 25.01.2017 |