EP3296694 - COMPRESSOR CONDUIT LAYOUT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ingersoll-Rand Industrial U.S., Inc. 800-E Beaty Street Davidson, NC 28036 / US | [2020/18] |
Former [2018/12] | For all designated states Ingersoll-Rand Company 800-D Beaty Street Davidson, NC 28036 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARTMAN, Ryan D 5130 Bentgrass Run Drive Charlotte, NC North Carolina 28269 / US | 02 /
PETERS, Michael 297 River Birch Circle Mooresville, NC North Carolina 28115 / US | [2018/12] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/12] | Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 17191305.6 | 15.09.2017 | [2018/12] | Priority number, date | US201615267867 | 16.09.2016 Original published format: US201615267867 | [2018/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3296694 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/22, H04W4/029, H04W4/33, G01B11/02, G01C3/00, G01S5/02, G01S17/08, G06K9/00 | [2020/46] | CPC: |
G01C3/00 (EP,US);
G06F30/18 (CN);
G01B11/026 (EP,US);
G06F18/25 (US);
G06F30/17 (CN);
G06F30/20 (CN);
G06T17/05 (US);
G06V20/20 (EP,US);
H04W4/029 (EP);
H04W4/33 (EP);
G01S17/08 (EP,US);
G01S5/0284 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/12] | G01C21/20, G01B21/00, G01S17/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/44] |
Former [2018/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERDICHTERLEITUNGSLAYOUTSYSTEM | [2018/12] | English: | COMPRESSOR CONDUIT LAYOUT SYSTEM | [2018/12] | French: | SYSTÈME D'AGENCEMENT DE CONDUIT DE COMPRESSEUR | [2018/12] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/44] | 02.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/33] | 31.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016069690 (LI TAO [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0014] ** paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0157] *; | [I]US2016245646 (HART COLIN W [US]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document * |