EP3470639 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR GENERATING A REDUCING AGENT GAS FROM A LIQUID OR SOLID REDUCING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Winterthur Gas & Diesel Ltd. Schützenstrasse 1-3 8401 Winterthur / CH | [2019/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kadau, Dirk Heinrich-Wolff-Strasse 17 8046 Zürich / CH | 02 /
Brutsche, Martin Räterschenstrasse 31 8418 Schlatt / CH | 03 /
Peitz, Daniel Bruggerstrasse 135 5400 Baden / CH | 04 /
Elsener, Martin Burghaldenweg 52 5313 Klingnau / CH | 05 /
Carelli, Andreas Bassersdorferstrasse 67 8305 Dietlikon / CH | [2019/16] | Representative(s) | Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [2019/16] | Application number, filing date | 17196592.4 | 16.10.2017 | [2019/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3470639 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/20 | [2019/16] | CPC: |
F01N3/2066 (EP,US);
F01N3/208 (US);
B01D53/9431 (US);
B01J19/0013 (US);
B01J7/02 (US);
F01N3/26 (US);
B01J2219/00058 (US);
B01J2219/00132 (US);
F01N2240/25 (EP,US);
F01N2590/02 (EP,US);
F01N2610/02 (EP,US);
F01N2610/06 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/31] |
Former [2019/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES REDUKTIONSMITTELGASES AUS EINEM FLÜSSIGEN ODER FESTEN REDUKTIONSMITTEL | [2019/16] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR GENERATING A REDUCING AGENT GAS FROM A LIQUID OR SOLID REDUCING AGENT | [2019/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION D'UN GAZ D'AGENT RÉDUCTEUR À PARTIR D'UN AGENT RÉDUCTEUR LIQUIDE OU SOLIDE | [2019/16] | Examination procedure | 25.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/31] | 25.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 04.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JPH06165913 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK) [X] 1-3,8,11,12,14 * abstract * * figure 8 * [Y] 7,13 [I] 4-6,9,10; | [Y]WO02092512 (CHEMITHON CORP [US]) [Y] 13 * figure 10 *; | [XI]JP2004313917 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK) [X] 1,3,5,8,9,11,12,14 * abstract * * figure 1 * [I] 4; | [Y]CN103395801B (DATANG ENVIRONMENTAL TECHNOLOGIES ENGINEERING CO LTD; CHINA DATANG TEC) [Y] 7 * figure 1 *; | [X]CN205650094U (REN YIHU, et al) [X] 1,8,9,11,13,14* figure 1 * | by applicant | US6077491 |