06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
16.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
12.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.06.2023 [2023/24] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
29.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
22.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
08.07.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
20.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
13.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
18.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
30.07.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
30.07.2021 |
Change - inventor |
|
30.07.2021 |
Change - applicant |
published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
23.07.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
23.07.2021 |
Change - inventor |
|
21.07.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
21.07.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
15.03.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.02.2021 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
28.09.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.09.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.08.2020 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
02.04.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.03.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
20.03.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
07.01.2020 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
20.12.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
20.12.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.12.2019 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
14.10.2019 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
27.09.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.07.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.05.2019 |
First examination report |
|
29.04.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.04.2019 |
Change - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
25.01.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
25.01.2019 |
Change - designated states |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
25.01.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
15.01.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.09.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.06.2018 |
Change - inventor |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
05.12.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.11.2017 |
Change - representative |
|