Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3326465T | 27.07.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP17200781 | 09.11.2017 | DE102016223453 | 25.11.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3326465 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2020 | B1 | EP3326465 | 30.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102016223453 | 25.11.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102016223453 | 30.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102016223453 | 25.11.2016 |